February 9, 2023
Lloyd’s of London announced that Andrew Brooks has been appointed as deputy chair of the Council of Lloyd’s. Brooks recently stepped down as chief executive officer of Ascot Underwriting Ltd. – a position he held for 15 years. He also …
July 23, 2021
Lloyd’s announced the appointment of Vicky Carter as deputy chair of Lloyd’s, effective Sept. 1, 2021. Carter has been an elected member of Lloyd’s Council since February 2019 and has worked in the Lloyd’s market for 40 years, starting her …
November 8, 2019
Re/insurance market Lloyd’s announced its decision to merge the Council of Lloyd’s and the Franchise Board, effective from June 1, 2020, after receiving widespread support from across the market. The news follows five months of consultation across the Lloyd’s market, …
January 30, 2019
Lloyd’s confirmed the appointment of former U.S. Senator John E. Sununu of New Hampshire as a new member of its Council for a three-year term, beginning Feb. 6, 2019. During his tenure in the Senate, Sununu served on the Senate …
March 9, 2017
Dominick Hoare, chief underwriting officer for Munich Re Syndicate Ltd., was elected this week to the position of corporate-external member to the Council of Lloyd’s, which is the body responsible for the supervision of the Lloyd’s market. Hoare represents Munich …
February 9, 2016
Lloyd’s have confirmed the election of three new members to the Council of Lloyd’s. Julian James and Neil Maidment were elected following a vote of working members of the Society of Lloyd’s and will serve a three year term. Philip …
January 8, 2016
Neil Maidment, Beazley’s chief underwriting officer, has been elected to the Council of Lloyd’s for a three year term, beginning on Feb. 1. Maidment has worked in the Lloyd’s market for 31 years, including 25 years at Beazley. In 2011, …
December 11, 2014
The Council of Lloyd’s has appointed John Parry as Lloyd’s Director of Finance with immediate effect. He will also become a member of the Lloyd’s Franchise Board. Parry has been acting Director of Finance since July and, following a competitive …
May 20, 2014
Lloyd’s has announced three appointments with immediate effect. Fred Hu will join the Lloyd’s Council and Joy Griffiths and Sean McGovern will join the Franchise Board. The bulletin described Hu as a “renowned economist and investor. “Between 1997 and 2010 …
December 2, 2013
Aon plc. announced that Dominic Christian, CEO of Aon UK Ltd and Executive Chairman of International at Aon Benfield, has been elected to the Council of Lloyd’s for a three-year term beginning February 1, 2014. The Council of Lloyd’s is …